+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 6325.).
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4653.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5302.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 22, 2014: AB 2616 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 8
August 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2616 Skinner By Hill
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
May 28, 2014: AB 2616 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
April 10, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Insurance.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor