+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2917.).
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2307.).
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1388.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 5, 2017: AB 261 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB261 Thurmond By Leyva
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2017: AB 261 THURMOND Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor