+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor