+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3075.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2612.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1768.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (13)
September 10, 2015: AB 260 LOPEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB260 Lopez By Mitchell
- Yeas: 40
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
June 2, 2015: AB 260 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor