+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Stricken from file.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3389.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2854.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1890.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On December 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2017: AB 26 Caballero Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 13, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB26 Caballero By Mitchell
- Yeas: 40
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 26 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor