+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.)
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2016: AB 2598 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7