+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 27).
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2022: AB 2597 Bloom Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 9
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1