+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 766, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6357.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5284.).
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4784.)
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2018: AB 2595 OBERNOLTE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Special Consent AB2595
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2018: AB 2595 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
April 3, 2018: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor