+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 11. Page 4513.)
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 27).
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 4).
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2022: AB 2593 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 15
April 27, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor