+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6822.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5519.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5605.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2018: AB 2593 GRAYSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2593 Grayson et al. By Nielsen
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 13, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 31, 2018: AB 2593 GRAYSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 12
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15