+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 6907.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 5900.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5006.)
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 29, 2018: AB 2592 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
August 28, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2592 Berman By Pan
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
June 6, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 3, 2018: AB 2592 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 25, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor