+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4719.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 8, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 8, 2020: AB 2592 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 21, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor