+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 11. Page 6105.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4953.).
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21).
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 4723.)
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2016: AB 2584 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2584 Daly By Mendoza
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
June 21, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2016: AB 2584 DALY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
May 3, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor