+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor