+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6567.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.)
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4851.).
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 23).
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5341.)
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5220.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2014: AB 2581 BRADFORD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2581 Bradford By Padilla
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: AB 2581 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor