+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1882.).
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1155.)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On February 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 19, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB258 Chávez By Lieu
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2013: AB 258 CHÁVEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor