+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1545.).
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 1214.)
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 7).
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB258 Levine By Leno
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 30, 2015: AB 258 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3