+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5479.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
- Coauthors revised.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: AB 2579 BURKE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15