+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and AGRI.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and V.A.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and V.A.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 8, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture]
- Yeas: 5
April 28, 2016: AB 2574 CHÁVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 4
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 6, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor