+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5113.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: AB 2573 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor