+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor