+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4874.).
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4464.)
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 11, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2563 Committee On V.A. (Irwin) By Nielsen
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
April 21, 2016: AB 2563 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
March 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Veterans Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor