+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 16, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor