+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2022.
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 25.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5207.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1720.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 1752.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
On January 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: AB 256 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 9
August 30, 2022: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB256 Kalra et al. By Kamlager
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 256 Kalra Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 13
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
March 23, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor