+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 12. Page 5801.).
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5108.)
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 8. Page 5107.).
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 5497.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5300.)
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 5, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 14
July 5, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Brough By Galgiani Reconsider
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: AB 2558 BROUGH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
May 9, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor