+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 6753.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6745.)
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Be placed on third reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4983.).
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6732.)
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 29).
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.)
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.)
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1,
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2014: AB 2557 PAN Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2014: Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB2557 Pan By Hill Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: AB 2557 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13