+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6487.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5415.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4874.).
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4871.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.)
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: AB 2556 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
August 25, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2556 Nazarian By Beall
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2556 Nazarian
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
May 19, 2016: AB 2556 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 11, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 20, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor