+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor