+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4501.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2016: AB 2555 W., P. & W. Assembly Third Reading By LEVINE
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
April 20, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 4
March 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor