+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 6441.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5313.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4902.)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2016: AB 2551 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 2
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 Gallagher By Nielsen
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2016: AB 2551 GALLAGHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
May 18, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1