+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 5. Page 4751.)
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4590.)
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 9).
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2014: AB 2549 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 13
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Ridley-Thomas
Type:
Primary Sponsor