+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6266.).
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4502.).
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5001.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4962.)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: AB 2546 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
August 14, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2546 Salas By Fuller
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2014: AB 2546 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor