+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5961.).
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4378.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4973.)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2014: AB 2540 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
August 7, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2540 Dababneh
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 23, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2014: AB 2540 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2014: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 22, 2014: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Dababneh
Type:
Primary Sponsor