+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5128.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 29).
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 4854.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 25, 2022: AB 2530 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 8
August 25, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2530 Wood et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 8, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2022: AB 2530 Wood Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 10
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 5, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor