+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 4597.)
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2014: AB 2526 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
April 22, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor