+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 13).
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and L. GOV.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor