+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5354.).
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4379.).
On August 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4819.)
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2020: AB 2524 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments By REYES
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 16
August 28, 2020: Consent Calendar AB2524
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2020: AB 2524 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
May 19, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor