+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6364.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4723.).
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1).
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5281.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2014: AB 2523 COOLEY Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2523 Cooley By Hill Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
July 1, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2014: AB 2523 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor