+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.)
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor