+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.).
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1792.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
On January 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 11, 2019: Special Consent AB252
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2019: AB 252 Daly Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
March 11, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor