+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4996.).
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4948.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2014: AB 2517 DALY Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 5, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor