+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 18, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor