+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Donnelly.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 5396.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- May 29-Motion to reconsider continued.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Donnelly.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 16. Page 5115.).
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2014: AB 2515 DONNELLY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 29
April 29, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor