+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 8. Page 6820.).
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5699.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on July 3 corrected.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 5430.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 25).
- Coauthors revised.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11).
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2018: AB 2514 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2514 Thurmond et al. By Delgado
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2018: AB 2514 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1