+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 872, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 7002.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5967.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- (Received pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).)
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O., JUD. and APPR.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5638.)
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 1).
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2018: AB 2511 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2511 Chau By Roth
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 13, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2018: AB 2511 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
May 1, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor