+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor