+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 885, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6577.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6576.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5568.).
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5483.)
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to second reading.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2016: AB 2503 OBERNOLTE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2503 Obernolte By Mendoza
- Yeas: 39
June 8, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 12, 2016: AB 2503 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor