+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor