+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 6499.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5446.).
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5439.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 10).
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2018: AB 2499 ARAMBULA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2499 Arambula et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2018: AB 2499 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor