+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.